Wong, Kevin Kim Ming (CPSO#: 87930)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2010