Wong, King Hwa (CPSO#: 87155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 303
420 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3R5
Phone: (705) 745-5464
Fax: (888) 974 5872
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: King Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 87155 )
Dr. Z. Nugent ( CPSO# 88369 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
420 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3R5
Phone Number: (705) 745-5464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KING HWA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012