Wong, Lawrence Hoi-Shun (CPSO#: 76752)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 3905 West 30th Avenue Vancouver, BC V6S 1X2
Date Received: 06 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 2007 to 05 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 2008 to 05 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2014