Wong, Lillian (CPSO#: 31030)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Mar 2017