Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wong, Mary May Yee (CPSO#: 53981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 175
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-3611
Fax: (905) 856-3612
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY MAY YEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986