Wong, Melanie Ray-Mon (CPSO#: 111201)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2016 to 25 Dec 2016
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 26 Dec 2016 to 01 Jan 2017
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2017 to 06 Jan 2017
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 2017 to 15 Jan 2017
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2017