Wong, Michael Foong (CPSO#: 92197)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia & Pain
Management
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: (416) 586-8899
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2009 to 15 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2009