Wong, Michael Ka Keu (CPSO#: 60966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UT MD Anderson Cancer Center
Melanoma Medical Oncology
1400 Holcombe Blvd., Unit 0430
Houston TX  77030
United States
Phone: 713 792 3798
Fax: 855 655 9664

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New York
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KA KEU WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990