Wong, Min Min Chi (CPSO#: 52040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 309
Rexdale ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 740-9663
Fax: (416) 740-0827
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIN MIN CHI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988