Wong, Nicholas Ho-Gar (CPSO#: 88142)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2008 to 07 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009