Wong, Paul Kim Chiu (CPSO#: 62478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K-Wing
Room 301
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 443-3308
Fax: (416) 443-3236
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul K. C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 62478 )

Business Address:
Suite 301 K-Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 443-3308

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL KIM CHIU WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991