Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wong, Peter Douglas (CPSO#: 53355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 303
Rexdale ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 743-6063
Fax: (416) 743-0101
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moodie Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moodie ( CPSO# 53795 )
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 53355 )

Business Address:
303 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 743-7520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 06 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1987