Wong, Peter Nathenial (CPSO#: 28205)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter N. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 20 Sunninghill Drive, Port Dover, ON, N0A 1N6
Instructions: Former patients should mail their requests
Date Received: 15 Jul 2016


Address: 20 Sunningham Drive, Port Dover, ON, N0A 1N0
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016