Wong, Peter Wai (CPSO#: 25530)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Nov 1987
Summary:

 In November 1987, Dr. Wong pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an 
 offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and 
 found Dr. Wong guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the 
 following penalty:

1.	Dr. Wong was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. Wong(s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 
 two years.

3.	This penalty of suspension was itself to be suspended, subject to the following 
 terms and conditions:

(a)	Dr. Wong was to continue to receive treatment and guidance from his 
 current psychiatrist, or from a psychiatrist of his choice acceptable to the Registrar.

(b)	Dr. 
 Wong was to waive the confidentiality of the doctor/patient relationship between himself and his 
 treating psychiatrist, and to direct the psychiatrist to deliver a report on his progress to the 
 Registrar quarterly.

(c)	Dr. Wong was to direct his employer or his Chief to submit to the 
 Registrar on a quarterly basis a report of satisfactory conduct.

(d)	Dr. Wong was to have an 
 attendant present at all specialty examinations of female patients.

Failure to comply with these 
 conditions, or the receipt of an unsatisfactory report by the Registrar, would result in the 
 immediate lifting of the suspension of penalty, and would result in the commencement of the full 
 two-year period of suspension of Dr. Wong(s licence to practice.

Delivery of the reports, as 
 required by sections 3(b) and 3(c) above, was to commence three months after the date upon which 
 this Order became final.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 24 Nov 1987