Wong, Rene (CPSO#: 75499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
E N 12-217
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4053
Fax: (416) 340-3314
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Nov 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Jul 2000 to 22 Aug 2000
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 07 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2003