Wong, Richard Chuen-Kit (CPSO#: 104454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nova Southeastern University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2934 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2E4
Phone: 416-667-8488
Fax: 416-477-0573
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD CHUEN-KIT WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2017