Wong, Richard Leung (CPSO#: 57481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 940-0112
Fax: (905) 940-9271
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wong ( CPSO# 57481 )

Business Address:
601 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone Number: (905) 940-0112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD LEUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988