Wong, Roland Chee Kong (CPSO#: 59292)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Dec 2012
Summary:

On December 12, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Roland Chee Kong Wong 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that: 
 
He failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to: 
 
      his completion of the Special Diet Allowance (SDA) forms, in that he did not take the 
      necessary steps to satisfy himself that the fifteen patients, whose records were before the 
      Committee, had the conditions reported on the forms.  
      his record-keeping. Dr. Wong's level of documentation in the fifteen charts reviewed 
      supporting confirmation of each condition varied from minimal to non-existent. 
      his OHIP billing, in that Dr. Wong did not obtain sufficient information to attest to the 
      various medical conditions which he confirmed on the SDA forms. Consequently, he did 
      not meet the requirement of taking a reasonable history of the reported condition prior to 
      billing OHIP for a partial assessment in the fifteen charts reviewed. 
 
He engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional, by confirming 
diagnoses on SDA forms, without first satisfying himself that the patient had the specified 
condition.  
 
On January 22, 2014, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Wong's certificate of registration for a period of six months, to 
      commence fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order. 
2.    Dr. Wong attend before the Panel to be reprimanded. 
3.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wong's 
      certificate of registration for a period of one year from the date of Dr. Wong's return to 
      practice, except the conditions in paragraph 3d and f, which shall remain in effect until 
      completion: 
 
      a.    Within 30 days of his return to practice, Dr. Wong shall participate in and 
            successfully complete a preceptorship in medical record keeping and in the 
            completion of special diet allowance forms with a preceptor who is to be 
            approved by the College in its sole discretion and who has signed an undertaking 
            to the College in the form attached hereto as Schedule A (The Preceptor).  
 
      b.    Dr. Wong shall abide by all recommendations of his preceptor with respect to 
            practice improvements and professional development. Dr. Wong shall provide 10 
            to 15 patient charts to his preceptor for review on a monthly basis until the 
            preceptor is satisfied that Dr. Wong's record keeping meets the standard of care 
            and the College approves a reduction in frequency. When the preceptor is satisfied 
            that Dr. Wong's record keeping meets the standard of the profession and the 
            College has approved, the preceptor shall continue the chart review every three 
            months for the remainder of the year. All charts to be selected for the preceptor 
            are to be selected from those patients seen in the previous month. The preceptor 
            shall provide reports to the College at the same frequency as the chart review.  
 
      c.    Dr. Wong shall retain a copy of all special diet allowance forms which he will 
            submit to his preceptor along with the corresponding patient chart on a monthly 
            basis. The preceptor will review and co-sign every copy of a special diet form and 
            will report any irregularity to the College. (To clarify, the special diet forms need 
            not be co-signed before they are given to the patient). 
 
      d.    Within 12 months of completing the preceptorship required by paragraph 3a 
            above, Dr. Wong shall undergo reassessment with regard to medical record 
            keeping and his completion of special diet allowance forms by a College 
            appointed assessor. Dr. Wong shall abide by all recommendations with regard to 
            medical record keeping and the completion of special diet allowance forms made 
            by the assessor and the results of the reassessment shall be reported to the College. 
 
      e.    Dr. Wong shall cooperate with the Compliance Monitoring and Supervision Staff 
            of the College who will conduct inspections of Dr. Wong's OHIP billings and 
            their supporting chart entries. These reviews are to occur during the year at 
            approximately 3, 6, 9 and 12 months from the date of Dr. Wong's return to 
            practice and Dr. Wong shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his 
            practice and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of 
            monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this order. Monitoring 
            this order, including the term under paragraph 3c above, shall include making 
            enquiries of the Ministry of Community and Social Services regarding Dr. Wong's 
            completion of special diet allowance forms.  
 
      f.    Dr. Wong shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing 
            the terms of this order. 
 
4.    Dr. Wong shall within 30 days pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the amount of 
      $35,000 and Dr. Wong shall provide proof of this payment to the Registrar of the 
      College. 
 
5.    Dr. Wong shall within 30 days pay the College its costs in this proceeding in the amount 
      of $26,360.  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov8,Dec6-9,2011Mar20,26,Apr,4,2012