Wong, Shirly (CPSO#: 57174)

Current Status: Suspended as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1992 to 27 Nov 1992
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1990
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 01 Jun 1998

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 01 Jun 1998


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Board of Inquiry Effective: 01 Jun 1998 Active View Details [+]