Wong, Siu Hung (CPSO#: 102652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Hill Medical Centre
Unit 20
1 Spadina Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B3M2
Phone: 9052378628
Fax: 9052378618
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siu Hung Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 102652)
Dr. A. Fu ( CPSO# 108996)

Business Address:
Suite 2
9255 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 1Y9
Phone Number: (905) 887-2222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIU HUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 3, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)