Wong, Sophia So Fan (CPSO#: 69906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sophia S.F. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 69906 )
Dr. H. Pham ( CPSO# 69900 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M3-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA SO FAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001