Wong, Susan Jennifer (CPSO#: 33534)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre, Medical Records Department, 501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON K1H 1C4
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016