Wong, Suzanne Toni (CPSO#: 80210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
St Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Bldg 4S - RM 423
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6790
Fax: (416) 530-6811
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 York Street, Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: 4163505900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suzanne T. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 80210 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
30 The Queensway
Suite 4-RM 423
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6790

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE TONI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2005