Wong, Tat Hang (CPSO#: 60961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
455 Carlaw Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3H9
Phone: (416) 462-3025
Fax: (416) 462-0607
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tat Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wong ( CPSO# 60961 )

Business Address:
455 Carlaw Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3H9
Phone Number: (416) 462-3025

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAT HANG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1990