Wong, Tat Ying (CPSO#: 55481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grace Health Centre
2830 Keele Street
Suite 402
Downsview ON  M3M 3E5
Phone: (416) 633-7337
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wong ( CPSO# 55481 )

Business Address:
Grace Health Centre
402 - 2830 Keele Street
North York ON  M3M 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 633-7337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAT YING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: April 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On March 15, 2017, the Disciplinary Committee of the Michigan Board of Medicine accepted Dr. Wong’s voluntary surrender of his license to practice medicine in the state of Michigan, and ordered that Dr. Wong’s license is permanently surrendered. Dr. Wong admitted to having violated the Michigan Public Health Code by failing to complete the continuing education requirements for license renewal. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on April 14, 2017.