Wong, Thomas Kue-Ching (CPSO#: 28337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jun 1975 to 13 Jun 1976
Other - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013