Wong, Vanessa Hew-Ling (CPSO#: 82676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-3200
Fax: (416) 289-3220
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanessa H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wong ( CPSO# 82676 )

Business Address:
Suite 507
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-3200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA HEW-LING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011