Wong, Wei-yee Stephanie (CPSO#: 88565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-9097
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W.S. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wong ( CPSO# 88565 )

Business Address:
The Health Centre of Maple
Unit 1
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 832-3838

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WEI-YEE STEPHANIE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010