Wong, Winnie Wing Shan (CPSO#: 67888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-10 Zeidler Ledcor Centre
130 University Campus
Edmonton AB  T6G 2X8
Phone: (780) 492-8134
Fax: (780) 492-1600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. WINNIE WING SHAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1995