Wong, Yuk-Shing (CPSO#: 25369)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Lingnan University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 312 1110 Sheppard Ave E Willowdale M2K 2W2
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017