Wong-Pack, William Ki-Fong (CPSO#: 52043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Names: Wong Young Pack, William Ki-Fong (used until: 09 Jun 1998 )     Wong-Young Pack, William Ki-Fong (used until: 25 Mar 1986 )     Wong-Pack, William Ki-Fong (used until: 24 May 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Department Of Nuclear Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6095
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM KI-FONG WONG-PACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG-PACK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983