Wongpakaran, Tinakon (CPSO#: 82024)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Khon Kaen University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 23 Jan 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006