Woo, Anna (CPSO#: 65546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Hospital General Div.
4N-506
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5270
Fax: (416) 340-3959
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Woo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Woo ( CPSO# 65546 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
North Wing 4N-506
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993