Woo, Emile Chung-Hou (CPSO#: 71541)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2003