Woo, Joseph Chi Hung (CPSO#: 28801)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph C.H. Woo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016