Woo, Minna Nancy (CPSO#: 63949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
E N 12 218
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5214
Fax: (416) 340-3314
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Minna N. Woo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Woo ( CPSO# 63949 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
12th Floor, Suite EN12-218
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5214

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINNA NANCY WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1992