Wood, Carolyn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 85090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: (613) 256-8549
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1910 St Laurent Blvd.,
Suite 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Wood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wood ( CPSO# 85090 )

Business Address:
29 - 1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN ELIZABETH WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2007