Wood, Gavin Campbell Angus (CPSO#: 85269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4899
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gavin Wood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wood ( CPSO# 85269 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAVIN CAMPBELL ANGUS WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2013