Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wood, John Holmes (CPSO#: 58350)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jul 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016