Wood, Lorraine Emily (CPSO#: 43568)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorraine Wood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital, The Temmy Latner Center for Palliative Care, 600 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 15 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 15 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2015