Wood, Nancy Louise (CPSO#: 62473)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 04 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016