Woodbury-Smith, Marc Ronald (CPSO#: 90237)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woodbury-Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017