Woodhouse, Douglas Charles (CPSO#: 85921)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: WPSHC 6 Albert Street Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2007 to 26 Feb 2007
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015