Woodley-Cook, Joel Gregory Aron (CPSO#: 90936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL GREGORY ARON WOODLEY-COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODLEY-COOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014