Woodman, Kenneth James (CPSO#: 16152)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993