Woods, Anthony Craig (CPSO#: 80000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2655
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Penny Turner & Dr. Anthony Woods Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Turner ( CPSO# 74668 )
Dr. A. Woods ( CPSO# 80000 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CRAIG WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2010