Woods, David Murray (CPSO#: 33186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1984


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6009
Fax: (905) 521-6116
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Charlton X-Ray
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite B2
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 528-1465
Fax: (905) 528-1467
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M. Woods Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2006

Dr. D. Woods ( CPSO# 33186 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Radiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
Room G2
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
Suite 104
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAVID MURRAY WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1984