Woods, John Morgan (CPSO#: 15107)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Dec 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1994