Woods, Lauren Jane (CPSO#: 51421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: Menage, Lauren Jane (used until: 25 Sep 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
269 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1W2
Phone: (905) 628-6042
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren Woods Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Woods ( CPSO# 51421 )

Business Address:
269 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1W2
Phone Number: (905) 628-9037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN JANE WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983