Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Woods, Nancy Georgina (CPSO#: 55942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 266-4556
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Woods & Dr. Laurence Malo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Malo ( CPSO# 55745 )
Dr. N. Woods ( CPSO# 55942 )

Business Address:
250 - 123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY GEORGINA WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1987